MD HB920 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "agency contract" to include a specified agreement in which a student-athlete authorizes a person to assess and plan for the financial benefits that may arise out of the student- athlete's professional sports career; altering the definition of "athlete agent" to include specified individuals who facilitate the connection to a student-athlete signing an agency contract or who enter into a specified agreement with a student-athlete or solicit or recruit the student-athlete to enter into the agreement; etc.
Title
Maryland Uniform Athlete Agents Act - Definitions and Prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-28 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-24 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Economic Matters |