MD HB919 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the property management company of each senior apartment housing facility located in a geographic focus area in Baltimore City designated by the Mayor's Office of Sustainable Solutions under the Mayor's Violence Reduction Initiative that is located in zip codes 21217 or 21223 to contract with a licensed security guard agency for the provision of security guard services at the senior apartment housing facility at all times that the property management company is not open for conducting business on the site; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City – Senior Apartment Housing Facilities – Security Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {994162/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback