MD HB919 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County from issuing or renewing a license unless the Board is provided verification that undisputed taxes have been paid or that payment has been provided for; authorizing the Board to condition the issuance of a license for which a transfer has been approved on verification of specified information; and specifying that tax verification requirements apply to the principals and owners of specified entities.
Title
Prince George's County - Issuance, Transfer, and Renewal of Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-19 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-16 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments 863594/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-10 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Revenue and Taxes
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Prince George's County
Revenue and Taxes