MD HB918 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 369
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain definition of "serious offense" to remove a certain limitation on offenses that are included for purposes relating to representation by the Office of the Public Defender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 369
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-11SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-10HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-09HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB1048 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure16101(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure16204(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback