MD HB917 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 367
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the basis on which a person is prohibited from taking certain actions against a certain person or group, to include certain actions motivated either in whole or in part by another person's or group's race, color, religious beliefs, sexual orientation, gender, disability, or national origin, or because another person or group is homeless.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Basis (2nd Lieutenant Richard Collins, III's Law)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 367
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-13SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (131-1)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {442113/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB606 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 368

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Law10304(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback