MD HB916 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing from one-third to one-half the maximum portion of a home improvement contract price that a person may receive as a deposit before or at the time of execution of the home improvement contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts - Deposits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-2) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (133-2)
2018-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-08HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-07HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback