MD HB916 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, from increasing the premium for an insured who becomes a surviving spouse based solely on the insured's change in marital status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639
2017-03-31HouseReturned Passed
2017-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2017-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-15SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2017-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {843390/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2017-02-16HouseHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0916&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0916f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0916t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_639_hb0916t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0916_84339001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0916.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0916_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0916_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0916,h-0430&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0916,s-0978&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback