MD HB916 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a Maryland corporation or a real estate investment trust has the power to renounce specified business opportunities in its charter or declaration of trust or by a specified resolution; repealing specified provisions of law relating to dividends payable in shares of one class of a corporation's stock to holders of shares of another class of the corporation's stock; altering the circumstances under which a corporation registered as an open-end company may redeem shares of its stock from any stockholder; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551
2014-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2014-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2014-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2014-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2014-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2014-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2014-03-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2014-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2014-02-26HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback