MD HB916 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the juvenile court, except under specified circumstances, from committing a child who has committed a specified offense to the Department of Juvenile Services for out-of-home placement; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-5) (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-19) (Y: 118 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-16HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 651
2013-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2013-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (134-5)
2013-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2013-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2013-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {558073/1 Report Adopted
2013-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2013-03-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2013-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (118-19)
2013-03-25HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
2013-03-23HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {782316/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2013-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-07HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0916&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0916f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0916t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0916e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/Chapters_noln/CH_651_hb0916e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0916_78231601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0916_55807301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0916.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0916_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0916_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0916,h-0730&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0916,s-1163&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0916,h-1307&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback