MD HB916 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to take all necessary actions to ensure that, by May 1, 2014, all tolls collected in connection with the William Preston Lane, Jr. Memorial Chesapeake Bay Bridge and parallel Chesapeake Bay Bridge are collected by means of electronic toll collection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Electronic Toll

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-23 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means Withdrawn
2011-02-28 Hearing cancelled
2011-02-16 Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-11 First Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback