MD HB915 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the African American Heritage Preservation Program in the Maryland Historical Trust to identify and preserve buildings, communities, and sites of historical and cultural importance to the African American experience; requiring the Trust to develop and administer the Program in partnership with the Commission on African American History and Culture; requiring the Governor to include $1,000,000 in the annual capital budget submission for the Program for fiscal year 2012 and each fiscal year thereafter; etc.
Title
African American Heritage Preservation Program
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Del. John Bohanan [D] | Del. Emmett Burns [D] | Del. Rudolph Cane [D] |
Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Dereck Davis [D] | Del. Tawanna Gaines [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] |
Del. Adrienne Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (42-3) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-04-01 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-01 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (107-31) | |
2010-03-19 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Grants
Historical Matters
Minorities
Planning, Department of
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Bonds
Sunset
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Grants
Historical Matters
Minorities
Planning, Department of
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Bonds
Sunset