MD HB913 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the minimum and maximum limitation amounts of certain standard deductions allowed for an individual under the Maryland income tax; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Title
Income Tax Standard Deduction – Alteration and Cost of Living
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB631 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0913?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0913f.pdf |