MD HB912 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending, from May 31, 2021, to May 31, 2024, the termination date for certain provisions of law relating to the authority of the Central Collection Unit to collect certain unpaid video tolls and associated penalties that are recalled by the Maryland Transportation Authority.
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority – Video Tolls – Collection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Debt Collection
Emergency Bills
Fees
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Debt Collection
Emergency Bills
Fees
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
State Finance and Procurement | 3 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 1414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0912?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0912f.pdf |