MD HB912 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB143
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing certain taxpayers with federal adjusted gross income for the taxable year that is $6,000 or less to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain dependent children under certain circumstances; providing that the credit is equal to $500 for each qualified child; allowing certain taxpayers to claim a refund in the amount of any excess credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019, but before January 1, 2025; etc.
Title
Maryland Child Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB912 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
SB638 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
SB638 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 751 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0912?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0912f.pdf |