MD HB911 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB26
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the qualifications an individual must have to be licensed as a psychologist by the State Board of Examiners of Psychologists.
Title
Health Occupations - Psychologists - Licensure Qualifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {593029/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB911 (Carry Over) 2022-04-05 - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 18 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |