MD HB911 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the date from June 1, 2019, to April 1, 2020, by which the Department of Natural Resources is required to convene in a certain manner the Oyster Advisory Commission; altering the version of the fishery management plan for oysters that the Department is required to develop before taking certain management action governing oyster sanctuaries; requiring the Department to include certain information in the interim report to be submitted by August 1, 2021, to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 597
2020-03-16HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-28SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-02-25HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments {240017/1 Adopted
2020-02-24HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB808 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2020(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources4204(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources4215(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback