MD HB911 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors; requiring the Senate Chair and House Chair of the Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness to serve as cochairs of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to identify and compile information on unaccompanied homeless minors and make recommendations regarding policy initiatives to address their needs, including funding requirements; and requiring the Workgroup to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 553
2019-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {338573/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {262511/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0911&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0911f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0911t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0911e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_553_hb0911e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0911_26251101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0911_33857301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0911.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0911_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0687.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0911_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1111.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1353.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback