MD HB910 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain county boards of education, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, to ensure that a certain student is screened to identify if the student is at risk for reading difficulties; authorizing a county board to use a screening instrument that includes a normed rapid automatized naming assessment for certain students; requiring a county board to monitor a student who receives structured literacy reading instruction for an appropriate time period; requiring a county board to provide certain progress reports; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-04-09HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateSenators Pinsky, Zucker, and Bates
2018-04-09SenateConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-09SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2018-04-07HouseDelegates Luedtke, Rose, and Patterson
2018-04-07HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-07HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2018-04-07HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (43-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {344539/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (135-1)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {525861/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0910&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0910f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0910t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0910_52586101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0910_34453901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0910_78312301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0910_28332101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb0910.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0910_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0504.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0910_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1219.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0910_28332101.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1520.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback