MD HB909 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the amount of annual compensation of the president of the Frederick County Board of Education, from $11,000 to $15,000, and of the other voting members, from $10,000 to $14,000, beginning with the commencement on December 6, 2022, of the term of office of members of the county board elected in the general election of 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Frederick County - Board of Education - Compensation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 363
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB744 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 364

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education35B-03(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback