MD HB909 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 89-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission to monitor and assess the impact of potential and actual federal changes to specified health care programs and to provide recommendations for State and local action to protect the access of residents of the State to affordable health coverage; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to annually report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Act

Sponsors

Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Angela Angel [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]
Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]
Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Eric Bromwell [D]
Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Michael Busch [D]Del. Ned Carey [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]
Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]
Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]
Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]
Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]
Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]
Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Tony Knotts [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]
Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]
Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Cory McCray [D]
Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]
Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]
Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]
Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]
Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]
Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]
Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]
Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. Karen Young [D]
Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-48) (Y: 89 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {103726/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected (50-88) (Y: 50 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29SenateRereferred to Finance
2017-03-28SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2017-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (89-48)
2017-03-24HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-24HouseFloor Committee Amendment {276784/1 Adopted
2017-03-24HouseFloor Amendment {103726/1 (Delegate W. Miller) Rejected (50-88)
2017-03-24HouseFavorable with Amendments {676788/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-24HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2017-03-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0909&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0909f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0909t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0909_10372601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0909_27678401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0909_67678801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0909.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0909_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0909,h-0887&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0909,h-0903&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback