MD HB908 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide certain benefits under certain insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for certain fertility preservation procedures; providing a certain exception for a religious organization that requests and receives an exclusion from in vitro fertilization coverage; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-2) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 715
2018-04-02HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (133-2)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {416183/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback