MD HB908 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide certain benefits under certain insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for certain fertility preservation procedures; providing a certain exception for a religious organization that requests and receives an exclusion from in vitro fertilization coverage; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2019.
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-2) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-2) (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715 |
2018-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-2) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {416183/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assessments
Chemical Tests
Drugs
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Hospitals
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Religion
Reproductive Matters
Spouses
Storage
Assessments
Chemical Tests
Drugs
Health
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Hospitals
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Religion
Reproductive Matters
Spouses
Storage