MD HB908 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Nursing to establish, beginning January 1, 2015, a program through which the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository reports to the Board specified criminal history information for specified applicants; establishing requirements for the Board to place specified licensees and certificate holders on inactive status if specified documentation of a medical condition is submitted to the Board; etc.
Title
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-0) (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-0) (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {606889/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Electrologists
Electronic Government
Fees
Fines
Fingerprinting
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Judicial Review
Licenses
Medication Technicians
Notices
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Information
Records
State's Attorneys
Subpoenas
Theft
Witnesses
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Electrologists
Electronic Government
Fees
Fines
Fingerprinting
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Judicial Review
Licenses
Medication Technicians
Notices
Nurses
Nursing Assistants
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Information
Records
State's Attorneys
Subpoenas
Theft
Witnesses