MD HB905 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, beginning on January 1, 2021, a prescriber or dispenser of a prescription drug to have access to and use, under certain circumstances, certain technology that provides patient-specific prescription drug benefit and cost information in a certain manner; requiring certain payors, providers, pharmacies, and other organizations to take certain actions necessary to facilitate access to and use of the technology; etc.
Title
Prescription Drug Benefits - Use of Real-Time Benefit Check Technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Commerce and Business
Communications
Disclosure
Drugs
Electronic Communication
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Industry and Technology
Insurance - Health
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Prices
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Commerce and Business
Communications
Disclosure
Drugs
Electronic Communication
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Industry and Technology
Insurance - Health
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Prices
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 145 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |