MD HB904 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain exception relating to law enforcement officers to the prohibition on carrying certain weapons on public school property; requiring a public institution of higher education to post certain signs in prominent locations on the property; requiring the Secretary of State Police to issue a letter to a certain applicant affirming that a permit has been issued; requiring the Board of Regents for the University System of Maryland to incorporate into its bylaws, policies, and procedures the current weapons practice; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gun–Free Higher Education Zones

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-49) (Y: 90 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {663721/2 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (53-77) (Y: 54 N: 78 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {453820/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (51-84) (Y: 52 N: 85 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {253626/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (50-84) (Y: 51 N: 85 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (89-49)
2018-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03HouseFloor Amendment {253626/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (50-84)
2018-04-03HouseFloor Amendment {453820/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (51-84)
2018-04-03HouseFloor Amendment {663721/2 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (53-77)
2018-04-03HouseFloor Amendment {453522/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
2018-04-03HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Rey) Adopted
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {984469/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-03-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0904&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0904f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0904t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0904_98446901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0904_25362601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0904_45352201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0904_45382001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0904_66372102.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0904.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0904_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1057.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback