MD HB903 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a court in a certain action for repossession to provide contact information for the appropriate county board of health and local department of social services to the tenant or other occupant of the premises under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord and Tenant – Surrender of Premises – Required Information to a Tenant or Other Occupant

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2020-02-19HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property8401(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback