MD HB903 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain information to be provided to the parents of a child with a disability under certain circumstances; establishing the Access to Attorneys, Advocates, and Consultants for Special Education Program; establishing the Access to Attorneys, Advocates, and Consultants for Special Education Fund; requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $2,000,000 to the fund beginning in fiscal year 2026; etc.
Title
Education - Access to Attorneys, Advocates, and Consultants for Special Education Program and Fund - Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-2) |
2024-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {383427/1 Adopted |
2024-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB797 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Appropriations
Attorneys
Awareness and Outreach
Budgets
Communications
Comptroller
Counties
Courts
Data
Demographics
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Disabled
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Fees
Gifts
Governor
Hearings
Interest
Investments
Job Training
Language
Local Government Mandates
Mediation
meetings
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Physically Disabled Persons
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Special Education
Students
Treasurers
Volunteers
Youth
Advertising
Appropriations
Attorneys
Awareness and Outreach
Budgets
Communications
Comptroller
Counties
Courts
Data
Demographics
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Disabled
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Fees
Gifts
Governor
Hearings
Interest
Investments
Job Training
Language
Local Government Mandates
Mediation
meetings
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Physically Disabled Persons
Poverty
Primary and Secondary Education
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Special Education
Students
Treasurers
Volunteers
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 8 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 8 | 413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 8 | 413.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |