MD HB902 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 462
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 462
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain requirements that a person be a resident for a certain period of time, a taxpayer, or a registered voter to be issued certain statewide alcoholic beverages licenses and permits; requiring that a person, to be issued a certain statewide license or permit, remain a resident for the duration of time that the license or permit is in effect; repealing from certain local alcoholic beverages licenses certain durational residency requirements; making conforming changes; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Durational Residency Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 462 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-02 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB765 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Commerce and Business
Communications
Counties
Jurisdiction
Municipal Corporations
Records
Registration
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Voting
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Commerce and Business
Communications
Counties
Jurisdiction
Municipal Corporations
Records
Registration
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Voting