MD HB900 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 359
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying the authority, powers, and duties of officers and employees of the Field Enforcement Division in the Office of the Executive Director of the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission over certain matters; substituting references to the Division and the Commission, respectively, for references to the Comptroller in certain provisions relating to alcohol and tobacco; requiring the Commission and the Comptroller to cooperate in sharing of certain information and personnel in certain inspections and other activities; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 359
2020-03-16HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-13SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {973192/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB911 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 360

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2019(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages1304(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages1313(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages1314(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages1315(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages1317(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages1321(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages4109(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages6101(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages6103(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages6105(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages6107(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages6108(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages6202(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages6203(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages6204(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages6205(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages6308(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages6328(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure2101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3201(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions26201(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions8301(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General2102(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General2103(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General2105(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General2107(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback