MD HB90 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing certain provisions of law relating to the authority of the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to enter into certain installment purchase agreements and create debt to acquire the development rights for agricultural or forestry land as part of the St. Mary's County Agricultural Land Preservation Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-10SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-06SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-03HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-02HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-30HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2005(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback