MD HB9 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB460
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Human Services to post on its website a free online course on the identification, prevention, and reporting of child abuse.
Title
Family Law - Mandatory Reporter Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-4) |
2021-02-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2020-09-23 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB460 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 5 | 716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |