MD HB897 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Maryland Stadium Authority to issue certain bonds to finance site acquisition, design, and construction of any portion of a certain sports entertainment facility, subject to certain limitations; authorizing the Authority to issue certain bonds to finance the planning, design, and construction of certain Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor facilities, subject to certain limitations; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Hearing 4/08 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-9) |
2022-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-05 | House | Floor Amendment {593820/1 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {363328/1 Adopted |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Bonds
Budgets
Buses
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Conventions
Counties
Debt Management
Economic Development
Fairs
General Assembly
Grants
Liability
Lottery
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Nonprofit Organizations
Prince George's County
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Works, Board of
Racing
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Special Events
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Stadiums
Television
Theaters
Time
Transportation, Department of
Weights and Measures
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Bonds
Budgets
Buses
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Contracts
Conventions
Counties
Debt Management
Economic Development
Fairs
General Assembly
Grants
Liability
Lottery
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Nonprofit Organizations
Prince George's County
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Public Works, Board of
Racing
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Special Events
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Stadiums
Television
Theaters
Time
Transportation, Department of
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 611.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 611.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 613 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 618 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 625 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 628 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 646.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 646.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 657.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 657.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 11 | 243 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 2 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |