MD HB897 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from selling or offering for sale engine coolant or antifreeze that contains more than 10% ethylene glycol unless it contains not less than 30 parts per million nor more than 50 parts per million denatonium benzoate; providing that the Act does not apply to specified engine coolant or antifreeze sales; etc.
Title
Engine Coolant and Antifreeze Bittering Agent Act
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. John Bohanan [D] | Del. Joseph Boteler [R] | Del. Jon Cardin [D] |
Del. William Frick [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Carolyn Howard [D] | Del. Peter Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-08 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-2) | |
2011-04-06 | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Special Order until 4/11 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | |
2011-03-27 | Re-assigned Finance & Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs & Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2011-04-09 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-04-08 | House Requests Returned | |
2011-04-07 | Delegates Frush, O'Donnell, and Stein | |
2011-04-07 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-07 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2011-04-07 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Floor Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Frush) Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Special Order until 3/25 (Delegate Frush) Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Special Order until 3/24 (Delegate Frush) Adopted | |
2011-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences