MD HB895 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing employees of the Howard County Library System to form, join, and participate in an employee organization and bargain collectively through a representative; requiring the library system and the certified exclusive representative to enter into a collective bargaining agreement that contains provisions regarding specified matters; requiring the library system to submit specified terms of the collective bargaining agreement to the Board of Library Trustees for Howard County for its acceptance or rejection; etc.
Title
Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-6) (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-43) (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-43) (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-6) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-43) |
2013-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
County Councils
County Executives
Courts
Discipline
Discrimination
Education - Local Bills
Fees
Hearings
Howard County
Libraries
Mediation
Petitions
Public Employees
Salaries
Strikes
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Budgets
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
County Councils
County Executives
Courts
Discipline
Discrimination
Education - Local Bills
Fees
Hearings
Howard County
Libraries
Mediation
Petitions
Public Employees
Salaries
Strikes
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment