MD HB894 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing collective bargaining rights for certain community college employees; establishing procedures for the selection and certification of an exclusive bargaining representative; establishing a cap of four on the number of bargaining units in each community college; requiring certain contracts and agreements entered into before September 1, 2022, to remain in effect until the agreement or contract expires; requiring the Governor to include certain amounts in the annual budget bill for Baltimore City Community College; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education – Community Colleges – Collective Bargaining

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2021-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (32-15)
2021-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-03-26SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-03-19SenateReferred Finance
2021-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (95-40)
2021-03-19HouseMotion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Cardin) Adopted
2021-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {853129/1 Adopted
2021-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-02-03HouseHearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-02HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB746 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-02 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education16403(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16412(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16414.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16701(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16702(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16703(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16704(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16705(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16706(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16707(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16708(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16709(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16710(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16711(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16712(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16713(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16714(n/a)See Bill Text
Education16715(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions32A-01(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions32A-05(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions32A-07(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions32A-08(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback