MD HB892 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1094
Note: Carry Foward to future HB653
Note: Carry Foward to future HB653
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to support and incentivize advanced industry infrastructure and resources that build on the existing strengths of the Western Maryland economy; establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure authority; establishing the Maryland Technology Infrastructure Fund to award financial assistance to public and private entities to support projects in Western Maryland; requiring a certain report; etc.
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Technology Infrastructure Pilot Program – Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {445966/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB892 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Referred Finance
HB892 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Referred Finance
SB709 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
HB892 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Referred Finance
SB709 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Economic and Community Development
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Partnerships
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Economic and Community Development
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Partnerships
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10-4C | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4C | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4C | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4C | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4C | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4C | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4C | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4C | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4C | 8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4C | 9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |