MD HB890 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain producers or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Paint Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment on or before January 1, 2021, and in accordance with certain requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve certain plans, including a certain assessment, submitted in accordance with the Paint Stewardship Program; prohibiting the sale of certain architectural paint under certain circumstances on a certain date; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Paint Stewardship Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (98-35)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {380112/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-05HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment91701(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment91702(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment91707(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment91733(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback