MD HB888 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from transporting a certain rapid fire trigger activator into the State or manufacturing, possessing, selling, offering to sell, transferring, purchasing, or receiving a certain rapid fire trigger activator, subject to a certain exception; defining "rapid fire trigger activator" as any device, including a removable manual or power-driven activating device, constructed so that, when installed in or attached to a firearm the rate at which the trigger is activated increases or the rate of fire increases; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator

Sponsors

Del. David Moon [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]
Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]
Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]
Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Michael Busch [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]
Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]
Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]
Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]
Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]
Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]
Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]
Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]
Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]
Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]
Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]
Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]
Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]
Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {703223/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-30) (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {603625/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-29) (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {243826/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (18-28) (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {323627/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-28) (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-11) (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {963123/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (16-30) (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-7) (Y: 129 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {553221/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (50-87) (Y: 51 N: 88 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {243325/1 (Delegate S. Howard) Rejected (37-96) (Y: 38 N: 97 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {553823/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (44-91) (Y: 45 N: 92 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (35-11)
2018-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {963123/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (16-30)
2018-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {323627/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-28)
2018-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {703223/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-30)
2018-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {603625/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-29)
2018-04-04SenateFloor Amendment {243826/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (18-28)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (128-7)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {553823/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (44-91)
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {243325/1 (Delegate S. Howard) Rejected (37-96)
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {553221/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (50-87)
2018-03-13HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Afzali) Adopted
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {642411/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-19HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0888&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0888f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0888t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0888_64241101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0888_24332501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0888_55322101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0888_55382301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0888_24382601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0888_32362701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0888_60362501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0888_70322301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0888_96312301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0888.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0888_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0384.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0385.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0386.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0467.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0888_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1103.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1104.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1105.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1106.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1107.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1108.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback