MD HB888 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring health insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for a refill of prescription eye drops under specified circumstances.
Title
Health Insurance - Prescription Eye Drops - Refills
Sponsors
Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. Donald Elliott [R] | Del. Wade Kach [R] |
Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] | Del. Aruna Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-22 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |