MD HB887 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission to obtain the approval from the Commissioners of St. Mary's County before submitting a loan application where the Commission seeks to incur debt upon the full faith and credit of the county; requiring the Commission to cause studies, plans, and estimates to be made for new facilities in certain portions of the county; requiring any excess revenue made by the Commission in the sale or transfer of certain debt to be exempt from taxation; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Mary’s County – Metropolitan Commission – New Facilities

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-03HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 426
2023-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2023-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2023-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed
2023-04-07SenateFavorable Adopted
2023-04-07SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2023-03-23SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-03-20SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2023-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2023-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2023-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2023-02-14HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-02-09HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
St. Mary's County1131(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11311G(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11317D(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11319C(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County11320(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1133C(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1135A(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1136B(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County1137C(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback