MD HB884 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain short-term rental platforms to collect the sales and use tax on the sale of the right to occupy certain short-term rentals.
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Short–Term Rentals
Sponsors
Del. Nick Mosby [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-32) (Y: 101 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-32) (Y: 101 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-32) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {355863/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Electronic Commerce
Fees
Housing
Leases and Rent
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Sales and Use
Electronic Commerce
Fees
Housing
Leases and Rent
Sales and Use Tax
Taxes - Sales and Use