MD HB883 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a circuit court has exclusive, original jurisdiction over all proceedings for the acquisition of private property for public use by condemnation; and providing that specified provisions of the Act establishing jurisdiction apply to property acquired for public use by a private company by the exercise of specified authority granted under federal law.
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Jurisdiction over Eminent Domain Cases - Circuit Court
Sponsors
Del. Dan Morhaim [D] | Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn |
2013-02-21 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions and Procedures
Condemnation
Jurisdiction
Public Works
Real Estate
Real Property
Civil Actions and Procedures
Condemnation
Jurisdiction
Public Works
Real Estate
Real Property