MD HB882 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 376
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 376
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the name of the Partial Expungement Workgroup to be the Workgroup to Study Partial Expungement; requiring the Workgroup to study and develop a plan and legislative recommendations for enabling the expungement of criminal charges that are currently not eligible for expungement because of the requirements of ยง 10-107 of the Criminal Procedure Article; requiring the Workgroup to submit a report on its recommendations to the General Assembly on or before January 5, 2022; etc.
Title
Workgroup to Study Partial Expungement
Sponsors
Del. Erek Barron [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 376 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-35) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {232713/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB874 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 377
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Emergency Bills
Expungement
Reports
Sunset
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Emergency Bills
Expungement
Reports
Sunset