MD HB881 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring residential treatment facilities to report complaints of sexual abuse and sexual harassment within 24 hours of receiving the complaint to the Behavioral Health Administration, the Office of Health Care Quality, or in the case of a minor, to Child Protective Services; requiring the Office and the Administration to develop and implement a certain reporting system; requiring facilities to develop and implement policies and procedures for responding to complaints of sexual abuse and harassment; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Facilities - Sexual Abuse and Harassment - Reporting and Prevention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-01SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-03-18SenateReferred Finance
2021-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2021-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {886488/1 Adopted
2021-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-02-11HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB815 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General10101(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General10701(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General10705(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback