MD HB881 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the motor vehicle offense of aggressive driving to include the commission of a certain number of an alternate set of certain motor vehicle offenses under certain circumstances; and establishing that certain persons charged with a violation for aggressive driving must appear in court and may not prepay the fine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles - Aggressive Driving

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-8) (Y: 129 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (128-8)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback