MD HB881 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the motor vehicle offense of aggressive driving to include the commission of a certain number of an alternate set of certain motor vehicle offenses under certain circumstances; and establishing that certain persons charged with a violation for aggressive driving must appear in court and may not prepay the fine.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Aggressive Driving
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-8) (Y: 129 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-8) |
2018-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Fines
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road