MD HB880 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the governing body of a county or municipality, unless expressly authorized by federal or State law, from enacting a local law that restricts or prohibits the transportation of certain animals for education, exhibition, competition, or entertainment purposes; and providing that in the event of a conflict between the application of the Act and certain provisions of federal or State law regarding animal care or public health and safety, the provisions of federal or State law shall control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties and Municipalities - Transportation of Animals - Limitation on Authority

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2019-03-06HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2019-03-05HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback