MD HB88 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain State policy goals with regard to the State's electric distribution system; requiring the Public Service Commission and the Maryland Energy Administration to provide assistance and support to electric companies for applying for and obtaining access to certain federal funds to meet the State's policy goals for the electric distribution system; requiring the Administration to identify certain funding sources; establishing labor standards for contractors and subcontractors participating in certain projects; etc.
Title
Electric Distribution System Planning and Required Labor Standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-37) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {473127/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2021-10-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB525 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-29 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Air Pollution
Apprentices
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Construction
Contractors
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Health
Federal Aid
Industry and Technology
Interstate Affairs
Investments
Licenses
Minorities
Motor Vehicles
Public Service Commission
Public Works
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Transportation
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Weather
Weights and Measures
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Air Pollution
Apprentices
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Construction
Contractors
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Health
Federal Aid
Industry and Technology
Interstate Affairs
Investments
Licenses
Minorities
Motor Vehicles
Public Service Commission
Public Works
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Transportation
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Veterans
Weather
Weights and Measures
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 3 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |