MD HB879 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Including the county in which an alleged counterfeit deed or other instrument is filed or recorded in a specified manner as a venue to prosecute a specified counterfeiting crime or other crime that establishes a specified counterfeiting crime.
Title
Criminal Law - Counterfeiting - Venue
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Steven DeBoy [D] | Del. William Frank [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Del. Joseph Minnick [D] | Del. Doyle Niemann [D] | Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-03-20 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-20 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Judiciary |