MD HB878 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Housing Opportunities Trust Fund as a nonreverting special fund to be used to promote equitable access to affordable housing for households of limited income in Howard County; and requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development for Howard County to report on the activity of the Fund during the prior fiscal year on or before December 1 each year.
Title
Howard County - Department of Housing and Community Development - Housing Opportunities Trust Fund Ho. Co. 05-22
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 704 |
2022-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Counties - Local Laws
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Howard County
Poverty
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Howard County
Poverty
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Howard County | 13.1600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |